Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/13/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/16/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/22/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/27/2008