Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/16/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/16/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/16/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/16/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/16/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/23/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/23/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/23/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/28/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/28/2008