Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/18/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/18/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/23/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/12/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/12/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/12/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/19/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/19/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/19/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/19/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/19/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/19/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/19/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/19/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/19/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/19/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/25/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/27/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/28/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/28/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/28/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/24/2008