There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Expressing support for designation of a "National Funeral Director and Mortician Recognition Day".

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for designation of March 11, 2008, as "National Funeral Director and Mortician Recognition Day".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2823)
12/18/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
04/29/2008-3:58pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2008-3:58pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2008-3:58pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2823)
04/29/2008-3:50pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 892.
04/29/2008-3:50pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2823-2824)
04/29/2008-3:50pmMr. Kucinich moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/13/2008Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/13/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/18/2007Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
12/18/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/13/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/26/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/06/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform12/18/2007 Referred to
03/13/2008 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.892. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/29/2008)

Supports the designation of a National Funeral Director and Mortician Recognition Day.