Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/13/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/26/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/06/2008