Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/17/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/07/2008