Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/25/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/05/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2008