Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/26/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/15/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/15/2008