Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/14/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/26/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2008