Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/17/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/17/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/17/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/12/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/12/2008