Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/22/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/06/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/06/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/07/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/07/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/07/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/12/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/12/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/12/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/25/2008