Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/12/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/12/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/17/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/16/2008