Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/29/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/21/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/12/2008