Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/28/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/28/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/28/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/13/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2008