Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/03/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/24/2007