Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/07/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/19/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/19/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/19/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/19/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/19/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/19/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/19/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/04/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/04/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2008