Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/06/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/12/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/13/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/14/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/14/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/26/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2008