Text: H.Res.954 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (02/12/2008)


H. Res. 954



In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

February 12, 2008.  

Whereas Luis Aguilar was born in El Paso, Texas, on November 26, 1976, to Luis Aguilar and Cecilia G. Silva;

Whereas Luis Aguilar resided in Somerton, Arizona, and is survived by his mother and father, his wife, Erica Aguilar, his two children, Luis and Arianna, his brother, senior Border Patrol agent Marco Antonio Aguilar, and his sister, Angie Aguilar;

Whereas Luis Aguilar joined the United States Border Patrol on July 21, 2002;

Whereas on January 19, 2008, after over 5 years of dedicated service in the United States Border Patrol, Luis Aguilar selflessly paid the ultimate sacrifice in service to the United States;

Whereas Border Patrol agents carry out the vital role of protecting our Nation’s borders and ensuring the safety of the United States;

Whereas Border Patrol agents work devotedly and selflessly on behalf of the people of the United States, without regard for the peril or danger to themselves; and

Whereas the United States will forever be grateful for the service of Luis Aguilar and mourn his loss: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) recognizes the dedication and sacrifice made by the men and women who have lost their lives while serving as United States Border Patrol agents;

(2) honors Luis Aguilar for his service as a Border Patrol agent and for his sacrifice to the United States; and

(3) extends its deepest condolences to the family of Luis Aguilar.

Attest:





Clerk.