Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/07/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/07/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/07/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/12/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/12/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/28/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/10/2008