Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/06/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/13/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/13/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/12/2008