Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/07/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/07/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/07/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/07/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/12/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/12/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/13/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/14/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/14/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/04/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/06/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/06/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/14/2008