Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/28/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/28/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/28/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/28/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/28/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/28/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/28/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/28/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/28/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2008