Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/14/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/23/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/23/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/05/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/08/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/13/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/19/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/19/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/09/2008