Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/28/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/28/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/28/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/04/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/11/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/31/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/31/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/31/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/31/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/02/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/08/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/09/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/17/2008