Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 02/13/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/14/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/14/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/02/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/17/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/17/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/17/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/17/2008