There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the courage and sacrifice of those members of the United States Armed Forces who were held as prisoners of war during the Vietnam conflict and calling for a full accounting of the 1,729 members of the Armed Forces who remain unaccounted for from the Vietnam conflict.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/22/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 366).(text: CR 5/20/2008 H4175)
02/14/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/22/2008-10:06pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2008-10:06pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 366). (text: CR 5/20/2008 H4175)
05/22/2008-10:00pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR 5/23/2008 H4821-4822)
05/20/2008-11:46amAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2008-11:19amDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 986.
05/20/2008-11:19amConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4175-4178)
05/20/2008-11:18amMrs. Davis (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
02/29/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
02/14/2008Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
02/14/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/14/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/29/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.986.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.986. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/22/2008)

Expresses gratitude for, and urges states, localities, and all Americans to honor the courage and sacrifice of, members of the Armed Forces, including Samuel R. Johnson of Texas, who were held as prisoners of war during the Vietnam conflict.

Declares that the House of Representatives will continue to press for a full accounting of the 1,729 members of the Armed Forces and 34 U.S. citizens who remain unaccounted for from that conflict.

Honors all members of the Armed Forces who have fought and died in the defense of freedom.