Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/03/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/03/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/03/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/03/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/03/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/03/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/09/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/10/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/10/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/10/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/10/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/22/2008