Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/04/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/05/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/01/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/19/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/19/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/19/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/10/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/29/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/11/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/24/2008