Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 03/04/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/04/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/04/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/04/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/04/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/05/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/11/2008