Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/05/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/11/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/11/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/11/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/12/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/12/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/12/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/13/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/01/2008