Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/08/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/10/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/11/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/11/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/22/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/24/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/29/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/15/2007