Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/27/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 03/27/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/29/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/20/2007
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/25/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/25/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/16/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/10/2008