Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/28/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/02/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/03/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/17/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/19/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/24/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/26/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/27/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/01/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/15/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 12/03/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/03/2007