Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/28/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/28/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/12/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/16/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/17/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/19/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/26/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/29/2008