There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Tax Simplification Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to repeal the current Internal Revenue Code and replace it with a flat tax, thereby guaranteeing economic growth and greater fairness for all Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/29/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/29/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/17/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/01/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/10/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/29/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1040.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1040. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/29/2007)

Tax Simplification Act of 2007 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to replace the marginal income tax rates with a single rate of 19 percent (17 percent after December 31, 2009) on individual taxable income.

Redefines "taxable income" to mean the amount by which wages, retirement distributions, and unemployment compensation exceed the standard deduction. Increases the basic standard deduction and includes an additional standard deduction for dependents. Includes in taxable income the taxable income of each dependent child under the age of 14.

Replaces the current tax on corporations with a tax on every person engaged in a business activity equal to 19 percent (17 percent after December 31, 2009) of the business taxable income of such person. Makes the person engaged in the business activity liable for the tax, whether or not such person is an individual, a partnership, or a corporation.

Imposes a tax of 19 percent (17 percent after December 31, 2009) on the value of excludable compensation provided during the year by an employer for the benefit of employees. Makes the employer liable for the tax.

Repeals pension plan rules relating to : (1) non-discrimination; (2) contribution limits; and (3) restrictions on distributions. Revises rules relating to transfers of excess pension assets.

Repeals: (1) the alternative minimum tax; (2) all income tax credits; (3) estate, gift, and generation-skipping transfer taxes; and (4) income tax provisions, except certain provisions relating to retirement distributions and tax-exempt organizations.

Declares it not in order in the House of Representatives or the Senate, unless waived or suspended by a three-fifths vote, to consider any legislation that increases or adds an income tax rate, reduces the standard deduction, or provides any exclusion, deduction, credit, or other benefit that reduces federal revenues.