Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/29/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/12/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/16/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/18/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/18/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/08/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/17/2007