Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/11/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/24/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/25/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/09/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/10/2007