Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/18/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/01/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/02/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/02/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/22/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/31/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/09/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/21/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/03/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/25/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/25/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/25/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/25/2008