Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/17/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/07/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/07/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/30/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/19/2008