Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/24/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/22/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/07/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/03/2007