Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/17/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/07/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/02/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/03/2007