Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/19/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/19/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/19/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/19/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/26/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/01/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/02/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/07/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/09/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/09/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/17/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/26/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/31/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/14/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/11/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/05/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/20/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/07/2008