Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/19/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/24/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/24/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/11/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/15/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/16/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/17/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/06/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/15/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/25/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/25/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/29/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/09/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/19/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/23/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/23/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/26/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/02/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 08/03/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/06/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/06/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/07/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/11/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/17/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/17/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/19/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/31/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/06/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/13/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/02/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/20/2008