Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/20/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/09/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/09/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/19/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/29/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/13/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/28/2008