Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/24/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/24/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/01/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/16/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/21/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/21/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/22/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/23/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/19/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/12/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/16/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/17/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/17/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/16/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/13/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/03/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/03/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/05/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/11/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/25/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/25/2008