Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/23/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/24/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/02/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/26/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/15/2007