Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/24/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 04/24/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/02/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/02/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/02/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/02/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/26/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/18/2008