Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/25/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/25/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/25/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/08/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/05/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/13/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/20/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/11/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/02/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/27/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/27/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/29/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 04/02/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/03/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/08/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/21/2008