Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/30/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/01/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/15/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/16/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/22/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/22/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/12/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/28/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/02/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/02/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/02/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/16/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/17/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/24/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/25/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/07/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/17/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/17/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/21/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/22/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/23/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/15/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/16/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/18/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/18/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/18/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/22/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/23/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/26/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/26/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/02/2008