Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/07/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/05/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/15/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/25/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/28/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/10/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/06/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/06/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/26/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/13/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2008